U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00073
  • Case Name: Flores v. Sinclair Wyoming Refining Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 24, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 15, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 12, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 12, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 11, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 06, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • October 04, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 14, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 01, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • September 01, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 01, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 01, 2016: [Praecipe]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Response]
  • May 31, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 31, 2016: [Third Party Complaint]
  • May 16, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 16, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 16, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 15, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.