U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00074
  • Case Name: McElroy v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 14, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 29, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 26, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 26, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 22, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 04, 2016: [Reconsideration]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • June 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 04, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 18, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.