U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Knopf v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 14, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • August 22, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 13, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 10, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 10, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • August 08, 2018: [Compel]
  • August 03, 2018: [Supplement]
  • August 03, 2018: [Compel]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Compel]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Mandate]
  • April 16, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Transcript Letter]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • April 07, 2017: [USCA Order]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Staying Case]
  • March 24, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • March 23, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 23, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • March 23, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 23, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 23, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • March 23, 2017: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 13, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • March 08, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 08, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 06, 2017: [Vacate]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 20, 2017: [Request for Hearing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • February 10, 2017: [Reply Brief]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 31, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 27, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 20, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Designation]
  • November 17, 2016: [Designation]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 22, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • April 20, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 20, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.