U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Devon Energy Production Company LP v. Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [In Court Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Reply]
  • April 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2019: [Reply]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 27, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 18, 2019: [Brief]
  • March 14, 2019: [Brief]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 26, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 21, 2019: [Status Report]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Transcript]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Brief]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 13, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 15, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 03, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 24, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Scheduling Conference Order]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Transcript]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • May 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2018: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • May 08, 2018: [Reply]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • May 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 17, 2018: [Compel]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 16, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • February 09, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Setting Hearing]
  • December 04, 2017: [Status Report]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Status Report]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • August 22, 2017: [Stay Case]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • June 15, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2017: [Alias Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • May 22, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 18, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Petition for Review]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • February 02, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • February 02, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • January 25, 2017: [Consolidate Cases for Trial]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Reply]
  • November 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2016: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 28, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 27, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 25, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • July 19, 2016: [Consolidate Cases for Trial]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 18, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • May 04, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.