U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00076
  • Case Name: Carson v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 08, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • September 07, 2017: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 24, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Reply Brief]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 13, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 17, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 25, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.