U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00081
  • Case Name: Buck v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [USCA Notification]
  • November 09, 2016: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • November 09, 2016: [USCA Order]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • September 22, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • September 21, 2016: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • September 09, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 08, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Reply to Response]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 17, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 26, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.