U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Neely v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • April 18, 2018: [USCA Order]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 06, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • December 01, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 28, 2017: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • November 20, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 20, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Dismissing Case]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Response]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Reply to Response]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 12, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 17, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 26, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.