U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Driscoll v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Mandate]
  • August 06, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [USCA Notification]
  • November 07, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • October 26, 2016: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • October 13, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 12, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • July 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 17, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 26, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.