U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00084
  • Case Name: Murphy v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • May 19, 2017: [USCA Order]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [USCA Notification]
  • February 27, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 17, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • February 10, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 01, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • January 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Mandamus]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Reply to Response]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 13, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 27, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.