U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Cupps et al v. Pioneer Canal-Lake Hattie Irrigation District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • December 17, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 15, 2021: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • December 02, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 02, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 01, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 17, 2021: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
  • November 01, 2021: [Transcript]
October, 2021
  • October 11, 2021: [Statement]
  • October 04, 2021: [Trial Brief]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Statement]
  • September 15, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • September 14, 2021: [Bench Trial - Began]
  • September 14, 2021: [Bench Trial - Completed]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 23, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 19, 2021: [In Limine]
  • August 19, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • August 13, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • August 12, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 28, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • July 27, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2021: [In Limine]
  • July 22, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 21, 2021: [Strike]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 14, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Reply to Response]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Response]
  • March 19, 2021: [Brief]
  • March 03, 2021: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Response]
  • October 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • May 19, 2020: [Minute Order]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 12, 2020: [Status Report]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Mandate]
  • April 20, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 13, 2020: [USCA Order]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • April 10, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 10, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • April 04, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • April 03, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 03, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • April 03, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 02, 2018: [Statement]
  • April 02, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 09, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 09, 2018: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • February 09, 2018: [Statement]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 26, 2018: [Deposition]
  • January 26, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 26, 2018: [Bench Trial - Began]
  • January 26, 2018: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • January 12, 2018: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 10, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 10, 2018: [Witness List]
  • January 09, 2018: [Supplement]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • December 08, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • December 08, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • October 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 26, 2017: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 18, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • August 14, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • August 14, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • August 08, 2017: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • August 07, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • August 07, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • August 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • July 10, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 05, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • June 08, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 15, 2017: [Response]
  • May 12, 2017: [Supplement]
  • May 04, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 03, 2017: [Magistrate Status Conference]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 19, 2017: [Status Conference]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 28, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • February 28, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • February 27, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 27, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 03, 2017: [Witness List]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 17, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Status Report]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • August 22, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 22, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • August 19, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 09, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 08, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 05, 2016: [Minute Order]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Brief]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 24, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 17, 2016: [Minute Order]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 09, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 08, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • May 25, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 25, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 25, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • May 20, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 20, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • May 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 05, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.