U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Melander v. State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 14, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • September 08, 2016: [USCA Order]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • August 29, 2016: [Sanctions]
  • August 15, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Letter(s)]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 10, 2016: [Supplement]
  • June 08, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 08, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • June 07, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 01, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 01, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order]
  • May 31, 2016: [Stay Case]
  • May 27, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • May 27, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 26, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 26, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order]
  • May 12, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • May 10, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Supplement]
  • April 29, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • April 29, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.