U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00091
  • Case Name: Stephenson v. Laramie County School District No 1 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 19, 2017: [Dismiss]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • July 24, 2017: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • July 24, 2017: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • July 24, 2017: [Quash]
  • July 21, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • July 12, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 23, 2017: [Acceptance of Service]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 19, 2017: [Protective Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 29, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 15, 2017: [Compel]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Transcript Letter]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 30, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • January 05, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 30, 2016: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 14, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 28, 2016: [Transcript]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 03, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Brief]
  • September 19, 2016: [Dismiss]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 22, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 19, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 18, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 15, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 03, 2016: [Set Aside]
  • August 01, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 27, 2016: [Opposition]
  • July 25, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 22, 2016: [Strike]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 15, 2016: [Set Aside]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 13, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 12, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • July 12, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • July 08, 2016: [Brief]
  • July 08, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • June 20, 2016: [Opposition]
  • June 09, 2016: [Stay Case]
  • June 02, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 24, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 12, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order]
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 29, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • April 29, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.