U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Rejda v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Letter(s)]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 20, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
November, 2016
  • November 25, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • August 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • July 19, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 19, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 02, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 02, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.