U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Goodwin v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • April 04, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Letter(s)]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Letter(s)]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Reply to Response]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 02, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 02, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 02, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.