U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00100
  • Case Name: Encinias v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [USCA Order]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 02, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • September 28, 2017: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • September 14, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 13, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Reply Brief]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • March 06, 2017: [Lift Stay]
  • March 06, 2017: [Supplement]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Staying Case]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Reply Brief]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 13, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • June 10, 2016: [Stay Case]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 04, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 04, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.