U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Aflague v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • March 24, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 16, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 15, 2016: [Stay Case]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 22, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 04, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 04, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.