U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Johnson v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 22, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [USCA Order]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 28, 2016: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • July 28, 2016: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • July 27, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 26, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 22, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Stay Case]
  • July 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 23, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 04, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 04, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.