U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Miskell v. Black Hills Power Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 06, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 17, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 09, 2017: [Status Conference]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 05, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 09, 2016: [Compel]
  • November 02, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 18, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 15, 2016: [~Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • June 29, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 29, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 21, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • May 26, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 26, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 04, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.