U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Associated Food Stores Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 17, 2017: [- Non Public Document]
  • March 17, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 15, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 17, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2016: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 05, 2016: [Removal]
  • May 04, 2016: [Complaint]
  • May 04, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.