U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00107
  • Case Name: Becker v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 20, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • August 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 20, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 20, 2016: [Stay Case]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 22, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 04, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 04, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.