U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00108
  • Case Name: Shotwell (MAK) et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 11, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Status Report]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [Status Conference]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • June 12, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • June 12, 2017: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 02, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 19, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 14, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 01, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • October 18, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • September 02, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 04, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 05, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 05, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • May 04, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • May 04, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 04, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.