U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00110
  • Case Name: Trinity Teen Solutions Inc v. Matson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 22, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [Protective Order]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [~Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 06, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 05, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 17, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2016: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • May 16, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • May 05, 2016: [Removal]
  • May 05, 2016: [Complaint]
  • May 05, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.