U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Westover v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Mandate]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [USCA Notification]
  • February 27, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 16, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 16, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 16, 2017: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • February 15, 2017: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • February 13, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • February 10, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 09, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Mandamus]
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • September 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 13, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 25, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 14, 2016: [Errata]
  • May 05, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 05, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.