U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Burtsfield v. Campbell County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 04, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Status Conference]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 11, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Reply Brief]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 13, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • September 06, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 02, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 07, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • June 24, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • June 14, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 06, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.