U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00114
  • Case Name: Harper v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Errata]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • February 06, 2018: [Dismissing Party]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 19, 2018: [Response]
  • January 18, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order]
  • January 04, 2018: [Reply]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order]
  • December 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 18, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 08, 2017: [Dismiss]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • November 29, 2017: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 16, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 13, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • October 13, 2017: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • October 03, 2017: [Requiring Service and Response]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • September 28, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 11, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order]
  • September 05, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • September 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 05, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 03, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [USCA Order]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Letter(s)]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 22, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 17, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • August 03, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 02, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 19, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 07, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Objection]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 27, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order]
  • June 14, 2016: [Compel]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 07, 2016: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • June 07, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 05, 2016: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.