U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00116
  • Case Name: Bloomgren v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Supplement]
  • October 17, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • October 17, 2018: [Status Report]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Status Report]
  • August 14, 2018: [Status Report]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Status Report Order]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • September 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • May 11, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 15, 2016: [Stay Case]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 25, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 09, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 09, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.