U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Velarde v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • March 13, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 13, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 18, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 17, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Reply to Response]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 24, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 22, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 23, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 09, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 09, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.