U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00118
  • Case Name: Miranda v. Wyoming Department of Transportation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • March 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 02, 2018: [Reply]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 22, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 22, 2018: [Response]
  • February 09, 2018: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • February 09, 2018: [In Limine]
  • February 09, 2018: [Brief]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Strike]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Strike]
  • January 29, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 26, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 25, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Supplement]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 08, 2017: [Reply]
  • December 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 17, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order]
  • November 17, 2017: [Strike]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • November 13, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 26, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • May 03, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 03, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 02, 2017: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 13, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • April 13, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • April 12, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Reply]
  • July 19, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 20, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 13, 2016: [Reply]
  • June 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 03, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • May 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 25, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 11, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.