U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00122
  • Case Name: Lonedog v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Dismissing Case]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Suggestion of Death]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • October 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 03, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 16, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.