U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Sanchez v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 02, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • January 18, 2018: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • January 05, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 05, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 13, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 04, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • August 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 06, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 17, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.