U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:08-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Yellowbear v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Director
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Response]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 29, 2018: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • April 30, 2018: [Reply to Response]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • February 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 01, 2017: [USCA Order]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [USCA Order]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [USCA Notification]
  • December 22, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 08, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 06, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 10, 2016: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • November 09, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • November 07, 2016: [Opposition]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • October 12, 2016: [Misdirected Appeal Document]
  • October 11, 2016: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 29, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Status Report]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • June 22, 2016: [Response]
  • June 22, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • June 17, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 14, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 13, 2016: [Status Report]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Mandamus]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • May 19, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 18, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.