U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00129
  • Case Name: Carey v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 22, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 22, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • November 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 02, 2016: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • September 01, 2016: [USCA Order]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • August 31, 2016: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • August 18, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 17, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • August 08, 2016: [Stay Case]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 08, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 19, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.