U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Huckfeldt v. State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [USCA Order]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 03, 2017: [USCA Notification]
  • January 03, 2017: [Misdirected Appeal Document]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 03, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 29, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 29, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 29, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • December 29, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • October 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2016: [Brief]
  • October 03, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • August 15, 2016: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2016: [Response]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 08, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 19, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 19, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.