U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00132
  • Case Name: Summit Gas Resources Inc v. Bighorn Gas Gathering LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 23, 2016: [Show Cause]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 07, 2016: [Reply]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 31, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 01, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 20, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 20, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 20, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 20, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 02, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 23, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 23, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.