U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00134
  • Case Name: State Farm Life Insurance Company v. Hooper et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 16, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 08, 2016: [Distribution of Funds]
  • September 07, 2016: [Errata]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • August 29, 2016: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • August 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Response]
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • July 21, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 21, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 21, 2016: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • July 21, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • July 21, 2016: [Crossclaim]
  • July 21, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 20, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • July 11, 2016: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • July 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 11, 2016: [Opposition]
  • July 07, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 07, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 07, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • July 01, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Entry of Default]
  • June 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 21, 2016: [Crossclaim]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • June 13, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 10, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 09, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 06, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 24, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • May 24, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order]
  • May 24, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.