U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00136
  • Case Name: Cubillos v. Vujasinovic & Beckcom PLLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 10, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Transcript]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2016: [Request for Hearing]
  • August 15, 2016: [Request for Hearing]
  • August 15, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • August 01, 2016: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • August 01, 2016: [Dismiss]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 27, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 27, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 25, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.