U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00137
  • Case Name: Miller v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order]
  • November 03, 2016: [USCA Order]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Response]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [USCA Notification]
  • August 08, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • July 29, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • July 28, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 28, 2016: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • July 28, 2016: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • July 27, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 26, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 21, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 15, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 15, 2016: [Stay Case]
  • July 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 15, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 26, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.