U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00138
  • Case Name: Aleman-Blanco v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 22, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 22, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • August 08, 2016: [Stay Case]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 21, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • May 31, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.