U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Conard v. Erchonia Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 06, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 05, 2017: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • October 05, 2017: [Strike]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 02, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 18, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 11, 2017: [Status Conference]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 06, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 15, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 08, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 08, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Setting Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 25, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 13, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 13, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • June 13, 2016: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • June 13, 2016: [Transmittal of Documents]
  • June 06, 2016: [Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.