U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00144
  • Case Name: James v. Machol & Johannes LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 10, 2017: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • March 14, 2017: [Application]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • January 26, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • January 05, 2017: [Reply Brief]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order]
  • December 23, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Brief]
  • December 16, 2016: [Opposition]
  • December 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 28, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • November 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2016: [Compel]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 25, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 12, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 07, 2016: [Financial Entry]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 06, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 06, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.