U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00148
  • Case Name: Travelers Indemnity Company v. Zakco Commercial Consultants Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 21, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 20, 2017: [Default Judgment]
  • March 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • February 24, 2017: [Default Judgment]
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • February 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 16, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • January 05, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • December 14, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 13, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 13, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 31, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • October 18, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • October 18, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order]
  • October 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 05, 2016: [Exhibit]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Request for Hearing]
  • September 28, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 27, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • September 06, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 02, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • September 02, 2016: [Application]
  • September 01, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • August 16, 2016: [Entry of Default]
  • August 16, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 16, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 04, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 01, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 06, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.