U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00147
  • Case Name: McGinty v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • October 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • October 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 26, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 16, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • September 06, 2016: [Letter(s)]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 24, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 21, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 08, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • June 06, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.