U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00149
  • Case Name: Seymour v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on 2255 Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • May 24, 2018: [Response]
  • May 18, 2018: [Brief]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • April 26, 2018: [Lift Stay]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Staying Case]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 21, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 19, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 21, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 07, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • June 07, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.