U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Big-D Construction Corporation et al v. Rafter H Construction LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 29, 2020: [Vacate]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order]
  • April 27, 2020: [(TRMD)Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335)]
  • April 27, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • April 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Affidavit]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Reply Brief]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Response]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • July 02, 2019: [Reply Brief]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Response]
  • June 24, 2019: [Objection]
  • June 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 13, 2019: [Objection]
  • June 13, 2019: [Intervene]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Writ Returned]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 18, 2019: [Application for Writ]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • February 14, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • February 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 23, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 21, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 18, 2018: [Set Aside]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Response]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 17, 2018: [Writ Returned]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • April 06, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 02, 2018: [Response]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Writ Returned]
  • March 23, 2018: [Judgment Debtor Exam]
  • March 23, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 22, 2018: [Application for Writ]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order]
  • March 13, 2018: [Brief]
  • March 09, 2018: [Response]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order]
  • March 06, 2018: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • March 06, 2018: [Deposition]
  • March 06, 2018: [Status Conference]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Response]
  • February 12, 2018: [Response]
  • February 07, 2018: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • February 07, 2018: [Response]
  • February 05, 2018: [Objection]
  • February 05, 2018: [Response]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Reply]
  • January 31, 2018: [Objection]
  • January 30, 2018: [Opposition]
  • January 30, 2018: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • January 30, 2018: [Quash]
  • January 29, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • January 29, 2018: [Application for Writ]
  • January 24, 2018: [Objection]
  • January 24, 2018: [Intervene]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 23, 2018: [Writ Returned]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2018: [Objection]
  • January 10, 2018: [Writ Returned]
  • January 10, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 10, 2018: [Application for Writ]
  • January 05, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • December 18, 2017: [Jury Verdict]
  • December 18, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • December 18, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 18, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • December 18, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • December 15, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • December 14, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • December 13, 2017: [Jury Trial]
  • December 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 11, 2017: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • December 11, 2017: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • December 11, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • December 08, 2017: [Proposed Verdict]
  • December 08, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 07, 2017: [Proposed Verdict]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 06, 2017: [Proposed Verdict]
  • December 06, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 04, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 04, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 29, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 21, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 21, 2017: [Leave to]
  • November 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 08, 2017: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 07, 2017: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • November 06, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2017: [Leave to]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Reply]
  • October 13, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 11, 2017: [Objection]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 09, 2017: [Strike]
  • October 03, 2017: [Pretrial Memorandum]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [In Court Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • August 21, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • August 17, 2017: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • August 09, 2017: [Vacate]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2017: [Status Conference]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 27, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 11, 2017: [Opposition]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Response]
  • June 29, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 27, 2017: [Leave to]
  • June 19, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 15, 2017: [Supplement]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 02, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 16, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 02, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • February 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 02, 2017: [Opposition]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • January 25, 2017: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 20, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 18, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 11, 2017: [Compel]
  • January 04, 2017: [Objection]
  • January 03, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • November 08, 2016: [Third Party Complaint]
  • November 07, 2016: [Third Party Complaint]
  • November 07, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 07, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Objection]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 26, 2016: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 26, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • October 26, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 25, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 18, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • October 18, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 10, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • October 10, 2016: [Strike]
  • October 07, 2016: [Strike]
  • October 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 06, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 05, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 28, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • September 28, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 12, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 09, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • September 09, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • September 09, 2016: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • September 08, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 08, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 22, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 01, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 13, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 23, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 14, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2016: [Praecipe]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.