U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Harmon v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 06, 2018: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • January 18, 2018: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • January 05, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Reply to Response]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 29, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 21, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 08, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • June 08, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.