U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00152
  • Case Name: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan Inc v. Kinnan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • December 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Opposition]
  • October 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 15, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 14, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • October 10, 2016: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • October 10, 2016: [Stay Case]
  • October 10, 2016: [Strike]
  • October 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 03, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 03, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 23, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 19, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 14, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Response]
  • August 18, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 18, 2016: [Response]
  • August 17, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 17, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • August 02, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 02, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • August 02, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 02, 2016: [Supplement]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 19, 2016: [Acceptance of Service]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 14, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 11, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 09, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • June 09, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.