U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00153
  • Case Name: Yellowbear v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Medium Correctional Institution Captain et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [USCA Order (Financial)]
  • September 26, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 25, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 04, 2017: [Response]
  • August 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 02, 2017: [Reconsideration]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Dismissing Case]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 07, 2017: [USCA Order]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • January 03, 2017: [Objection]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • December 29, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • December 22, 2016: [USCA Notification]
  • December 22, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Add Party]
  • December 13, 2016: [Response]
  • December 05, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • December 05, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 01, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • December 01, 2016: [Statement]
  • December 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • November 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 18, 2016: [Response]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2016: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • November 17, 2016: [Response]
  • November 16, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 14, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 14, 2016: [Stay Case]
  • November 09, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 08, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 08, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • November 07, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 07, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 03, 2016: [Appendix]
  • November 03, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • November 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 03, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 01, 2016: [Response]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • October 24, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • October 21, 2016: [Response]
  • October 19, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 18, 2016: [Add Party]
  • October 13, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 11, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • October 11, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 11, 2016: [Disqualify]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • October 05, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • October 04, 2016: [Response]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 29, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • September 27, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order]
  • September 23, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 21, 2016: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • September 12, 2016: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • September 09, 2016: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • September 08, 2016: [Reply]
  • September 01, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • August 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 29, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 29, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 23, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 22, 2016: [Reply]
  • August 18, 2016: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • August 18, 2016: [Response]
  • August 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 12, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 04, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 04, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • August 03, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • August 02, 2016: [Service of Process]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 02, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 25, 2016: [Supplement]
  • July 25, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 21, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 18, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 13, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • July 12, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • June 27, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • June 27, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • June 23, 2016: [Service of Process]
  • June 23, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 20, 2016: [Service of Process]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 10, 2016: [Service of Process]
  • June 10, 2016: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
  • June 10, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.