U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00154
  • Case Name: Safford v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [USCA Order]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [USCA Order]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 08, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • April 10, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 07, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 07, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 06, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • September 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 21, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 13, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • June 13, 2016: [Brief]
  • June 13, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.