U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00157
  • Case Name: Admiral Insurance Company v. Duran et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 25, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 15, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • June 02, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 22, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • May 22, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 17, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 15, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 08, 2017: [Stay Case]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order]
  • April 25, 2017: [Opposition]
  • April 24, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • April 10, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • April 10, 2017: [Brief]
  • April 10, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 03, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 23, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 20, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 10, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 10, 2016: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order]
  • September 28, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 20, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • September 07, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 01, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 01, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • September 01, 2016: [Third Party Complaint]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 11, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 04, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 18, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 15, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 15, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 14, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 01, 2016: [Acceptance of Service]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 17, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 14, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 14, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 14, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.