U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00159
  • Case Name: Belden v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Objection]
  • August 09, 2017: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 20, 2017: [Status Conference]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Objection]
  • April 10, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 07, 2017: [Strike]
  • April 07, 2017: [Objection]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice of Joinder]
  • March 15, 2017: [Reply]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • February 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 15, 2017: [Response]
  • February 08, 2017: [Appeal of Magistrate Order]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • January 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 30, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 30, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [Response]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 03, 2017: [Response]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 21, 2016: [Strike]
  • November 09, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 04, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 02, 2016: [Objection]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 26, 2016: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [Compel]
  • October 21, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 13, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 13, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 13, 2016: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • October 06, 2016: [Reply]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Strike]
  • September 29, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 27, 2016: [Strike]
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 23, 2016: [Strike]
  • September 15, 2016: [Reply]
  • September 12, 2016: [Reply]
  • September 06, 2016: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • August 05, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • July 18, 2016: [Letter(s)]
  • July 18, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 12, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 06, 2016: [Waiver of Service Issued]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 15, 2016: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
  • June 15, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.